Financial history TRINITY PFA

Charity number: 1174686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £14.48k £13.78k £13.60k £14.00k £8.94k
Total expenditure £9.75k £9.64k £18.10k £13.34k £9.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A