PRICKLEBUMS HEDGEHOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide emergency treatment, onward care and rehabilitation of sick, injured and orphaned wild British hedgehogs. To release strong, healthy hedgehogs back into their natural habitat.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 05 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE KATE GILES | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SANDRA PRIEST | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE REBECCA BRUNN | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.16k | £24.10k | £16.76k | £18.40k | £13.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.99k | £18.36k | £13.07k | £13.02k | £19.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 40 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 40 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 May 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 02 May 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 May 2022 | 397 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 May 2022 | 397 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Feb 2018 as amended on 01 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO FURTHER THE PRESERVATION OF OUR DECLINING WILD HEDGEHOG SPECIES AND THE CONSERVATION OF THEIR HABITAT IN SHROPSHIRE, WORCESTERSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE, AND SURROUNDING AREAS. 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING AN ACCESSIBLE RESCUE, CARE AND REHABILITATION SERVICE - PRIMARILY FOR SICK, INJURED OR ORPHANED WILD HEDGEHOGS IN NEED OF HELP, BUT INCLUSIVE OF OTHER SPECIES WHEN NECESSARY, WITH THE AIM OF RELEASING ALL ANIMALS BACK INTO THE WILD WHEREVER POSSIBLE. 3) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO HELP ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION ABOUT WILD HEDGEHOGS AND THEIR CARE, TREATMENT, REHABILITATION, PRESERVATION, AND HABITAT CONSERVATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRICKLEBUMS HEDGEHOG RESCUE
QUALITY SQUARE
LUDLOW
SHROPSHIRE
SY8 1AR
- Phone:
- 01584 878701
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window