TCL RE USE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We prevent items going to landfill and in turn are able to provide furniture, white goods and household items to the general public and to those on a low income at significantly reduced prices. We also work with a wide variety of agencies to seek to help those who are struggling to help themselves. Part of this is providing free furniture to referred at risk families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN JASON WILLIAM HENRY | Chair | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frances Elizabeth Rogers | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAVIER LESTA CANDAL | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £340.44k | £334.99k | £416.48k | £435.75k | £423.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £322.85k | £330.32k | £312.61k | £446.38k | £404.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £132.75k | £16.23k | £3.45k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, UNEMPLOYMENT, POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT, ILL-HEALTH OR SUCH OTHER ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE; 4.2. TO PROVIDE GRANTS TO CHARITIES, ORGANISATIONS, OTHER GROUPS AND INDIVIDUALS TO FULFIL EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; AND 4.3. THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, REUSE AND RECYCLING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1
330-348 Uphall Road
ILFORD
Essex
IG1 2JJ
- Phone:
- 02085535880
- Email:
- info@tclreuse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window