Financial history TECHTIVITY

Charity number: 1179177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £30.97k £20.46k £38.74k £27.29k £45.77k
Total expenditure £22.61k £19.42k £30.71k £23.56k £42.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.40k N/A £17.11k £7.00k £32.17k