THE SUDANESE PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sudanese Programme endeavours to inform the public about Sudan and South Sudan through conferences, workshops and lectures. It is above ethnicity, religion and politics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 February 2018: CIO registration
- TSP (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elhag Paul | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Noon Altijani Osman Abbakar | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Makol Bona Malwal | Trustee | 23 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANIS GEORGE HAGGAR | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Al-Shahi | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WILLIAM BARLTROP | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.05k | £32.50k | £3.40k | £3.30k | £3.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.44k | £5.79k | £10.50k | £9.59k | £11.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE SUDANESE PEOPLE OF BOTH THE REPUBLIC OF SUDAN AND SOUTH SUDAN, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CULTURAL, SOCIAL, SOCIO-ECONOMIC AND OTHER ISSUES FACING THE SUDANESE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH CONFERENCES AND LECTURES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 MIDDLE WAY
OXFORD
OX2 7LQ
- Phone:
- 07754369393
- Email:
- info@sudaneseprogramme.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window