Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY HOPE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1178124
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2025 | 331 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 September 2024 | 502 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2025 | 697 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 September 2024 | 867 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 March 2025 | 1062 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 September 2024 | 1232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1471 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window