HUCKNALL FLIGHT TEST MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hucknall Flight Test Museum acts, in affiliation with the Rolls-Royce Heritage Trust, as custodians of the aviation heritage, historical stories and events, associated with the Rolls-Royce Hucknall Flight Test Establishment site, in particular between the years 1934 to 1971, but additionally both before and after this period. Rolls-Royce Heritage Trust volunteer members run the museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 14 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miles Eliot Barrett | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Milan Petrovic | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHARON SEVERN | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Paul Randall | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN WILSON | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Spray | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM TODD | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.66k | £831 | £106 | £6.00k | £400.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £125 | £350 | £202 | £123.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 192 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE UNIQUE HISTORY OF THE WING HANGARS AT THE FORMER HUCKNALL AERODROME THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF HUCKNALL FLIGHT TEST MUSEUM. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT IN HERITAGE THROUGH OFFERING VOLUNTARY OPPORTUNITIES TO GAIN EXPERIENCE AND SKILLS IN MUSEUM OPERATIONS, CURATORSHIP AND EXHIBIT CREATION AND MAINTENANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hucknall Flight Test Museum
The Wing Hangar
Hives Way
Hucknall
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 6YH
- Phone:
- 01159633111
- Email:
- huflighttest@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window