THE FRIENDS OF DERBY ARBORETUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fulfill our aims by engaging with the residents of the area regardless of age, ethnic origin, ability, sex, belief or political affiliation and involving local people in improving Derby Arboretum; and carrying out and promoting environmental improvement, practical conservation, and supporting healthy activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derby City
Governance
- 04 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPHINE SIMISTER | Chair | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Elliott | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Joy Jackson | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael McNaught | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA MARY DIGNAM | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN BENFIELD | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.24k | £15.05k | £15.33k | £7.54k | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.54k | £16.56k | £16.59k | £4.44k | £5.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £76.81k | £11.05k | £9.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DERBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF DERBY ARBORETUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Loudon Lodge
57 Morleston Street
DERBY
DE23 8FL
- Phone:
- 01332824403
- Email:
- friendsderbyarbo@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window