Financial history ST ILLTYD PRIMARY SCHOOL'S PARENT TEACHER'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1174958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.45k £5.14k £5.63k £10.25k £18.58k
Total expenditure £13.85k £6.38k £3.77k £11.18k £17.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A