THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY ROTHERHITHE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England Parish Council - religious
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southwark
Governance
- 13 September 2017: Standard registration
- HOLY TRINITY CHURCH ROTHERHITHE PCC (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANDREW MICHAEL DOYLE | Chair | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Ann Sandy | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kosilan Naidoo | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Joan Pullin | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE BISHOP | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MURDOCH MADDISON | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA ROSEMARY SAMUELS | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ROLI OJO | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER ARTHUR HILL | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.74k | £151.41k | £112.04k | £128.95k | £115.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.67k | £146.58k | £63.45k | £54.64k | £106.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 BRYAN ROAD
LONDON
SE16 5HF
- Phone:
- 02072374098
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
holy-trinity-rotherhithe.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window