Financial history PORTHCAWL LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1175303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £20.52k £2.45k £6.22k £12.67k £4.55k
Total expenditure £23.13k £4.32k £6.94k £8.48k £4.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A