Trustees PORTHCAWL LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Charity number: 1175303

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOUG JONES | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Roberts | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norma Rees | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
William john Thomas Cosson | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONALD JAMES SUTTON | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Cosson | Trustee | 02 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melvin Rhys Lewis | Trustee | 02 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.