STEM IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, sustain and increase the knowledge of the education of young people in the subjects of Science, Technology, Engineering and Maths (also known as STEM); To advance the education of young people in life-long & social skills such as teamwork, communication, problem solving, resilience, decision making & time management. The geographical area covered will be London and the South East
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY KING | Chair | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Rutkowski | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Bristow | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GRAHAM | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
TOM MCGIFF | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.52k | £14.38k | £20.94k | £17.52k | £16.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.57k | £14.38k | £20.94k | £17.52k | £16.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1)TO ADVANCE (PROMOTE, SUSTAIN AND INCREASE THE KNOWLEDGE OF) THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SUBJECTS OF SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATHS (ALSO KNOWN AS STEM); 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN LIFE-LONG & SOCIAL SKILLS SUCH AS TEAMWORK, COMMUNICATION, PROBLEM SOLVING, RESILIENCE & TIME MANAGEMENT. THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA COVERED WILL BE LONDON AND THE SOUTH EAST. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 ST. MARGARETS ROAD
LONDON
W7 2PL
- Phone:
- 02088407985
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window