GARFORTH & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Garforth & District Lions club operate in town of Garforth and surrounding villages. We raise funds at an annual Gala, Beer Festival and on a Christmas street collection. The funds are used in our district to help the elderly, youth groups and those in need in the area. We also donate towards international projects through Lions clubs International Foundation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 04 October 2017: CIO registration
- GARFORTH & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB CIO (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Greenway | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Salter | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Hill | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Egginton | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Isley | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Isley | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Nelson | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Lines | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.05k | £10.96k | £37.20k | £24.45k | £22.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.72k | £12.86k | £25.62k | £34.91k | £26.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | £1.00k | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 May 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 May 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND & WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY: PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALTH ISSUES; PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIONS CLUB INTERNATIONAL
257 ALCESTER ROAD SOUTH
BIRMINGHAM
B14 6DT
- Phone:
- 01652652979
- Email:
- Gdlions.105c@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window