YOUTH CONCERN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting vulnerable young people in Aylesbury
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income:
£886,068
Donations and legacies | £753.28k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £9.03k | |
Investments | £10.36k | |
Other | £113.40k |
Total expenditure:
£723,103
Raising funds | £48.31k | |
Charitable activities | £674.79k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £13,729 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £48.31k | |
Charitable expenditure | £674.79k | |
Retained for future use | £162.97k |
People

24 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 November 2017: CIO registration
- 04 December 2019: Funds received from 277935 YOUTH CONCERN
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Michael Bedwell | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Charles Dix | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Ian Keating | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Maria Glover | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven Wells | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Jane Low | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS EDWARDS | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £432.41k | £394.37k | £557.71k | £657.91k | £886.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £326.01k | £468.29k | £484.93k | £584.69k | £723.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £101.97k | £12.50k | £24.50k | £43.53k | £13.73k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £478.83k | £572.21k | £753.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £17.75k | £3.47k | £9.03k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £623 | £7.10k | £10.36k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £60.50k | £75.12k | £113.40k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £455.52k | £538.67k | £674.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £29.41k | £46.03k | £48.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £65.53k | £5.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £1.92k | £2.40k | £2.07k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £454.30k | £567.97k | £751.47k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £184.58k | £225.51k | £245.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR VULNERABLE YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY WITHIN AYLESBURY VALE, WITH A PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 13 AND 25 BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISATION PROGRAMMES OF DEVELOPMENT, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B. ADVANCING EDUCATION; C. RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; D. PREVENTING YOUTH HOMELESSNESS E. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. RELIEVING THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF YOUNG PERSONS IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT. 3. PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING YOUNG PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE ÆSOCIALLY EXCLUDEDÆ MEANS ÆYOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 13 TO 25 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; RACE; GENDER; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; DISABILITY; ETHNIC ORIGIN; OR WHO ARE WITHIN, OR HAVE EXPERIENCED, THE PUBLIC CARE OR PENAL SYSTEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Uptown Coffee Bar
Whitehill Lane
Aylesbury
HP19 8FL
- Phone:
- 01296431183
- Email:
- admin@youthconcern.org.uk
- Website:
-
youthconcern.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window