UTTOXETER SKATING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in Uttoxeter by the provision of instruction and training in ice skating. This includes, but is not limited to, running off-ice classes, competitions, galas and social events to help build a strong family ice skating community in Uttoxeter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 15 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Horton | Chair | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Craddock | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Roach | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Fleeman | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Marston | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLARE FRANCES HUDSON | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2018 | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £4.38k | £1.72k | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £4.03k | £2.25k | £141 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 06 September 2020 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | 06 September 2020 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN UTTOXETER BY THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN ICE SKATING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UTTOXETER SKATING CLUB
Cinebowl
Dovefields Retail Park
Town Meadows Way
UTTOXETER
ST14 8AZ
- Phone:
- 07814070709
- Website:
-
uttoxeterskatingclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window