Trustees UTTOXETER SKATING CLUB
Charity number: 1175749

Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Horton | Chair | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Craddock | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Roach | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Fleeman | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Marston | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLARE FRANCES HUDSON | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.