Accounts and annual returns KINDLINK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1177210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 01 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 01 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 February 2025 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 February 2025 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 February 2025 478 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 February 2025 478 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 September 2023 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 September 2023 313 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 April 2023 545 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 April 2023 545 days late Download Open in new window