Financial history KINDLINK FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1177210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £28.35k £130.59k £475.32k £470.42k £355.08k
Total expenditure £33.61k £64.83k £354.95k £348.98k £215.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A