Accounts and annual returns SPRINGFIELD SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1176791
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2020 15 March 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 15 March 2021 42 days late
Annual return 01 April 2019 08 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 08 January 2020 On Time