GLANRAFON EVANGELICAL COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Glanrafon Evangelical Community Church is an Independent Evangelical Church but with a long association with the Evangelical Movement of Wales. It's aim is to promote the Evangelical Christian faith and Evangelical Charitable institutions in Llangollen. In particular to support, expand and develop a social and spiritual benefit to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 29 March 2018: Standard registration
- GLANRAFON EVANGELICAL CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES CORNFORD | Chair | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Douglas Anthonisz | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HUW CALCRAFT | Trustee | 02 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN GASKELL | Trustee | 18 November 1981 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.44k | £60.07k | £74.55k | £23.23k | £19.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.52k | £35.60k | £57.92k | £22.82k | £18.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOV 1981
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE TO PROMOTE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH AND EVANGELICAL CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN LLANGOLLEN AFORESAID AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT EXPAND AND DEVELOP THE CHURCH FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLANRAFON EVANGELICAL CHURCH
PRINCESS STREET
LLANGOLLEN
LL20 8RD
- Phone:
- 01978861151
- Email:
- infoglanrafon@gmail.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window