THE SAMATHA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 1973, The Samatha Trust is a Charitable Incorporated Organisation which fosters practice and study in the Samatha-Vipassana tradition. The Samatha Trust offers local weekly classes and residential meditation courses as well as online meditation classes and meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Germany
- Netherlands
Governance
- 10 September 2018: CIO registration
- 17 January 2022: Funds received from 266367 THE SAMATHA TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ADKINS | Chair | 13 May 2001 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Antony Rowlands | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angeline Woods | Trustee | 04 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles King | Trustee | 04 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Raikes | Trustee | 04 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Frances Warren | Trustee | 07 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor JOHN ELSNER | Trustee | 13 May 2001 |
|
|||||
CHARLES SHAW | Trustee | 15 June 1974 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS GILCHRIST | Trustee | 29 May 1973 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Dennison | Trustee | 28 May 1973 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £143.52k | £367.67k | £101.35k | £137.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £90.97k | £103.17k | £104.09k | £124.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 YEW TREE LANE
POYNTON
STOCKPORT
SK12 1PT
- Phone:
- 07515746590
- Email:
- info@samatha.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window