MOUNT-HOREB CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Religious Charity that has provided an oasis for prayer, worship and transformative encounters with God. A place where all are welcome to be restored, equipped for life and ministry and connect with others. A place where people are welcome for spiritually mentor-ship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 25 January 2018: CIO registration
- MOUNT Û HOREB CHURCH OF CHRIST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABIODUN OMOTOYE | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ADEDIPE | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.07k | £23.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.94k | £24.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 65
Albert Bigg Point
Godfrey Street
LONDON
E15 2SF
- Phone:
- 07947886956
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window