Financial history THE ABRAHAMIC REUNION (ENGLAND)

Charity number: 1177751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.37k £4.23k £714 £1.16k £2.30k
Total expenditure £3.36k £3.09k £1.74k £1.25k £3.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A