BUSH HILL PARK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church's main activities include public worship, teaching and discipleship, work with children and young people, mission and outreach, pastoral work, the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, and support of other charities. Many activities are undertaken jointly with other churches in the town and area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Enfield
Governance
- 17 January 2018: Standard registration
- BHPURC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN BRIAN WARD | Chair | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Caddies | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin David Hamblin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DIANN NICOLAIDES | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA ELAINE COOK | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.83k | £126.39k | £174.05k | £109.41k | £117.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.05k | £143.21k | £204.26k | £102.41k | £84.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH ACTS (1972 AND 1981) AND SCHEME OF UNION (1972) ADOPTED 16 MAR 2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCHEME OF UNION OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
BHP UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
25 MAIN AVENUE
ENFIELD
EN1 1DJ
- Phone:
- 02083665526
- Email:
- office@bhpurc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window