BACD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the charity is to advance the effective, safe and ethical practice of aesthetic medicine to the benefit of all concerned through leadership, provision of information, education, support, professional development and the maintenance of the highest professional standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 January 2019: Standard registration
- BCAM (Working name)
- BRITISH COLLEGE OF AESTHETIC MEDICINE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Catherine Fairris | Chair | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ahmed Khamis Hassan El Houssieny | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Haidar Hassan | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Deepa Panchalingam | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manav Bawa | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nestor Demosthenous | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Mariete SHOTTER | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bhavjit Kaur | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN BALFOUR ELDER | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.23k | £244.72k | £258.07k | £339.67k | £381.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £326.82k | £289.88k | £257.65k | £353.40k | £380.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 JUL 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 SEP 2017 as amended on 10 Sep 2021 as amended on 10 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE : (A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BY: I. PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF AESTHETIC MEDICINE; II. PROMOTING RESEARCH AND AUDIT OF AESTHETIC MEDICINE AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF IT; III. RECOMMENDING STANDARDS OF TRAINING IN AESTHETIC MEDICINE; IV. MAINTAINING MAINTAIN THE HIGHEST PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS IN PRACTICE OF AESTHETIC MEDICINE IN RELATION TO CLINICAL PRACTICE AND PATIENT CARE; V. ADVANCING THE EFFECTIVE, SAFE AND ETHICAL PRACTICE OF AESTHETIC MEDICINE; VI. PROMOTING THE PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND EFFECTIVE TREATMENT OF DISEASES, DISORDERS AND CONDITIONS IN RELATION TO THE PRACTICE OF AESTHETIC MEDICINE; AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY: I. PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THE PUBLIC AND PATIENTS II. FACILITATING CONTACT BETWEEN MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY AND OTHER INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS CONCERNED WITH THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF AESTHETIC MEDICINE, PARTICULARLY WITH THE AIM OF ENCOURAGING THE EXCHANGE OF CLINICAL EXPERIENCE, SCIENTIFIC THOUGHT AND INVESTIGATION; III. COLLABORATING WITH MEDICAL, ACADEMIC AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE IN THE PRACTICE AND DEVELOPMENT OF AESTHETIC MEDICINE; IV. PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT ACTIVITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR DOCTORS; V. ADVISE AND MAKE REPRESENTATIONS TO MEDICAL, GOVERNMENTAL, REGULATORY AND OTHER SUCH BODIES AS MAY BE CONCERNED WITH ANY OF THE ASPECTS OF AESTHETIC MEDICINE; AND VI. PROVIDING INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND ADVICE ON AESTHETIC MEDICINE AND ASSOCIATED HEALTH ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Harley Building
77 New Cavendish Street
London
W1W 6XB
- Phone:
- 01474823900
- Email:
- info@bcam.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window