S4S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established to work with young people, their families and wider communities by providing opportunities which they may not normally have access to. We aim to deliver programmes and projects which help all those we will work with to adopt healthy physical and mental lifestyles, be confident, raise employment aspirations, encourage resilience and support all to reach their potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Williams | Chair | 18 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MARSHALL | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL PURCELL | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WHYLEY | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.40k | £9.34k | £0 | £7.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.30k | £6.34k | £5.12k | £1.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 446 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 446 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND WIDER COMMUNITIES INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY:- A. PROVIDING TRAINING AND OTHER SUPPORT TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO ADOPT A HEALTH LIFESTYLE; AND B. PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO RAISE EMPLOYMENT ASPIRATIONS. 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH EDUCATION, TRAINING, SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
S4S FOUNDATION
WATERLOO HOUSE
4 WATERLOO ROAD
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV1 4BL
- Phone:
- 07590 661046
- Email:
- info@s4sfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window