Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER & ST PAUL'S, PICKERING
Charity number: 1176138
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gareth William Atha | Chair | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Edward Clark | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Irving | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Smith | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Miller Wass | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Smith | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Knowles | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Betty Southey | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Lindsay | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Caroline Cooney | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Orland | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gail Radka | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gena Douglas | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON RUTH HOLMES | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY KATHLEEN JARAM | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM STEVEN BULMER | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ELIZABETH ROBB | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.