GRACE CHURCH NOTTINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, PROCLAIMING THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL THROUGH WORD AND DEED IN NOTTINGHAM AND BEYOND. TRAINING LEADERS. PASTORAL CARE, SENDING WORKERS ACROSS THE UK AND TO OTHER NATIONS. PROVIDING RELIEF TO PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£678,710
Donations and legacies | £598.38k | |
Charitable activities | £77.21k | |
Other trading activities | £3.12k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£801,197
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £801.20k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £14,375 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £801.20k |
People

16 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Malawi
Governance
- 26 October 2017: Standard registration
- 25 July 2022: Funds received from 1103419 GRACE CHURCH NOTTINGHAM
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMILY ANNE TOPLISS | Chair | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Udueni | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE HAY | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN MATTHEWS | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY DAVID SAUNDERS WALKER | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £12.90k | £498.95k | £602.04k | £678.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £12.90k | £502.95k | £517.63k | £801.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.85k | £14.38k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £576.77k | £598.38k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.13k | £3.12k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £77.21k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.14k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £517.63k | £801.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £44.70k | £47.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.33k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.05m | £1.04m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1 | £132 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £361.11k | £201.49k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £456.99k | £417.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE FOURTH SCHEDULE HERETO AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR ELECTRONICALLY AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MINISTRY
1 CASTLE BOULEVARD
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 1FT
- Phone:
- 01159502332
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window