Accounts and annual returns THE SAI MAA LAKSHMI SHAKTI TRUST

Charity Number: 1176159
Charity reporting is overdue by 1732 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 637 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 637 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1002 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1002 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1367 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1367 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1732 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1732 days