BESIYATA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of people of all ages around the world including awarding grants and scholarships, the prevention and relief of poverty by providing loans and grants to individuals and organisations, advancing the Orthodox Jewish religion in accordance with the Shulchan Aruch ( Code of Jewish Law), protecting the physical and mental health of the sufferers of any medical condition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN SAM ROSE | Chair | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MORRIS ROSE | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID ROSE | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.00k | £173.32k | £307.93k | £152.20k | £315.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.85k | £112.67k | £188.94k | £281.45k | £110.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AROUND THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS; OR BY GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORLDWIDE THAT PROVIDE EDUCATION. 4.2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS OR LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 4.3 TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CODE OF JEWISH LAW (SHULCHAN ARUCH). 4.4 TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF ANY MEDICAL CONDITIONS AROUND THE WORLD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
168 ALBERT AVENUE
PRESTWICH
MANCHESTER
M25 0HF
- Phone:
- 01616370810
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window