THE BIRSTALL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To acquire and run Birstall Community Centre in an effort to provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation, ensuring that the building is maintained on behalf of the residents of Birstall and to use any surpluses for the benefit of the Birstall community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £15,750 from 1 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kirklees
Governance
- 15 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul David Glover | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Reilly | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|||||
John McLoughlin | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Hill | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Cooney | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Jones | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna Towell | Trustee | 24 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Evans | Trustee | 24 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN BLAMIRES | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR ELIZABETH ELLEN SMAJE | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.33k | £36.23k | £41.53k | £45.62k | £48.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.53k | £39.03k | £34.99k | £35.73k | £49.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.19k | £5.37k | £11.00k | £15.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.86k | £16.57k | £17.01k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Dec 2017 as amended on 01 Sep 2022 as amended on 02 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF BIRSTALL WEST YORKSHIRE, AS DELINEATED ON THE PLAN ANNEXED TO THIS CONSTITUTION (THE “DESIGNATED AREA”), WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Bond Street
Birstall
Batley
West Yorkshire
WF17 9EX
- Phone:
- 07969 998626
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window