FRIENDS OF VICTORIA PARK, STRETFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run the Community Building / Community Cafe / Community Events. Work with Trafford Council to improve the park facilities. Work with Schools to provide education opportunities. Run gardening and walking for health sessions. Run sport and exercise provision in the park. Environmental / Biodiversity / Art projects in the park. Work with other local community groups to improve Stretford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,935 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Trafford
Governance
- 30 August 2018: CIO registration
- 24 January 2025: Funds received from 1166001 STAFFORD CARNEGIE OLD LIBRARY TRUST
- FOVPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shelly Quinton-Hulme MBE | Chair | 24 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Jane McKie | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Asiya Yaqub | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Tresnan | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dan Adamson | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Bray | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Hodgson | Trustee | 20 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Clayson | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ADSHEAD | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ITA KIRRANE | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BARRY | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.53k | £239.58k | £349.67k | £312.26k | £237.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.63k | £112.98k | £389.22k | £331.54k | £285.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £32.00k | £2.50k | £26.47k | £39.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STRETFORD, TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF VICTORIA PARK, STRETFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Friends Of Victoria Park
Victoria Park Community Building
Victoria Road
Stretford
MANCHESTER
M32 0AD
- Phone:
- 01615231908
- Email:
- info@fovps.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window