COLD ASH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Early Years Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £87,652 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 12 September 2017: CIO registration
- 05 October 2020: Funds received from 1041160 COLD ASH PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Allum | Chair | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carlie Kowalski | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eloise Jayne Pilbrow | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Grace Cooper | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jarrod-Bryan James Price | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Bell | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lloyd Hanks | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £110.76k | £139.12k | £96.65k | £117.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £100.86k | £91.15k | £92.87k | £121.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £87.86k | £114.89k | £70.93k | £87.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cold Ash Pre-school
Hermitage Road
Cold Ash
Thatcham
RG18 9JH
- Phone:
- 07780664454
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window