Financial history BERWICK & DISTRICT FRIENDS OF DEMENTIA

Charity number: 1174583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.31k £2.20k £8.10k £15.84k £9.57k
Total expenditure £13.28k £1.76k £4.21k £11.23k £14.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A