2ND BENSON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1174818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting undertaken in accordance with the Scout Association POR

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £15,112
Total expenditure: £14,210

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 September 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD SAMUEL HENRY IRWIN Chair 11 December 2008
None on record
Owen Keith Clarke Trustee 12 July 2022
None on record
Dr Tanya Katherine Zane Baron Trustee 12 July 2022
None on record
GERAINT HUW WILLIAMS Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
ANDREW JAMES YOUNG Trustee 07 December 2008
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.83k £4.99k £7.24k £10.53k £15.11k
Total expenditure £9.51k £8.36k £8.89k £9.91k £14.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 March 2024 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2019 30 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 SPITFIRE CLOSE
BENSON
WALLINGFORD
OX10 6UH
Phone:
01491834008
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available