Trustees THE HONITON EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1174834

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Tucker | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheelagh Bazen | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Aisla Crampton | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Brooks | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Spoerry | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penny John | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARY ROSENTHALL | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|||||
PAMELA JOAN KEANE | Trustee | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH ANNE COLE | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Gubby | Trustee | 01 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
ALVI ELIZABETH FRANCES BLISS | Trustee | 01 November 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.