NEW COVENANT CHURCH ELTHAM

Charity number: 1175391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We participate and express Christian principles, doctrine and practices within the domain of our gatherings both in the United Kingdom and abroad. We are actively engaged within the community of Eltham and Welling in supporting individuals and families through care, friendships and fellowship; as well as in any areas they are in need such as sign posting to professional services where necessary.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,676
Total expenditure: £8,848

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ADELEKE ADENIYI Chair 31 October 2018
None on record
BENSON EYIN Trustee 31 October 2018
None on record
Rev ADEREMI DIPE Trustee 31 October 2018
None on record
Rev ABAYOMI IBIDAPO-OBE Trustee 05 December 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.03k £11.34k £6.66k £7.24k £12.68k
Total expenditure £20.50k £12.90k £7.75k £7.04k £8.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 9
Churchhill Court
Rush Grove Street
LONDON
SE18 5DN
Phone:
02088039883