ST JOHN'S EAST WARD OLD PEOPLE'S TREAT AND WELFARE COMMITTEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Kirklees
Governance
- 15 July 1981: Standard registration
- 11 August 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE GOOD COMPANION'S CLUB (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 DECEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 10 JUNE 1981 AS AMENDED 6 FEBRUARY 1985.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF THE ORIGINAL ST. JOHN'S EAST WARD.
Area of benefit
THE ORGINIAL ST. JOHN'S EAST WARD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window