LIGHTING EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lighting Education Trust operates with the backing of the lighting industry and profession, providing funds for educational courses at tertiary institutions and delivering the LET Diploma in Lighting Design in association with UCL, University College London. Grants are made to undergraduate and Post Graduate courses from funds generated from lighting Industry sponsors including Manufacturers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 July 2018: CIO registration
- 20 November 2019: Funds received from 1051939 THE LIGHTING EDUCATION TRUST
- LET (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH JOSEPH OGUS MBE | Chair | 31 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Hywel Davies | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Shaw | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iain Macrae | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM SOUTHCOTE ASTON FSLL | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID SIMPSON | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|||||
ROBERT GRAHAM VENNING BA, C.ENG | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.39k | £11.38k | £19.25k | £0 | £16.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.51k | £10.30k | £10.49k | £4.07k | £18.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ADVANCING EDUCATION BY FUNDING, DEVELOPING, ADMINISTERING, SUPPORTING OR PROVIDING FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATIONAL COURSES IN LIGHTING, LIGHTING DESIGN AND ENGINEERING, OR RELATED SUBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIBSE
222 BALHAM HIGH ROAD
LONDON
SW12 9BS
- Phone:
- 02086755211
- Email:
- LET@cibse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window