Accounts and annual returns ISLE OF WIGHT MENCAP

Charity number: 1177251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 August 2024 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 August 2024 205 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 February 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 February 2023 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window