Financial history GREENTECH APPS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1178251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.91k £56.44k £67.47k £122.28k £152.56k
Total expenditure £10.36k £21.56k £48.89k £73.63k £109.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A