Accounts and annual returns SHAFTESBURY BREAST CANCER AWARENESS

Charity number: 1177288
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 25 April 2025 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 25 April 2025 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 08 March 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 06 March 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required