GMC CHARITY TO END FGM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GMC activities primarily involve helping to organize FGM/C Religious Leaders Summits across the African continent, is an event that brings together high-level leaders including Heads of State, nationally influential religious leaders and high-profile media personalities, to create a national consensus on the need for the complete abandonment on ending FGM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income:
£689,190
Donations and legacies | £689.19k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£667,895
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £667.90k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £667.90k | |
Retained for future use | £21.30k |
People

1 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ethiopia
- Guinea
- Kenya
- Mali
- Nigeria
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- The Gambia
Governance
- 19 December 2017: CIO registration
- GMC CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Noon | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James McGarry | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Bridget Baumgartner-Henley | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH LINCOLN | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
LUCY KATE PALMER | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Anne Henley | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Cox | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gerard Doyle | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUSIKILU MOJEED | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHARLES RUSBRIDGER | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIA COOK | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £556.45k | £627.74k | £689.08k | £872.18k | £689.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £588.55k | £476.29k | £855.25k | £813.41k | £667.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £556.37k | £627.72k | £689.08k | £872.18k | £689.19k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £77 | £26 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £543.52k | £419.24k | £855.25k | £805.80k | £667.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £45.03k | £57.04k | £0 | £7.61k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £16.77k | £16.76k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.07k | £1.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £81.64k | £241.23k | £75.76k | £151.65k | £158.23k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.45k | £11.12k | £10.22k | £27.34k | £12.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Dec 2017 as amended on 26 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE WORKING IN JOURNALISTIC MEDIA IN AFRICA AND ACROSS THE WORLD TO ENABLE THEM MORE EFFECTIVELY TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE DANGERS TO PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH CAUSED BY THE PRACTICE OF FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION, THROUGH: 1.1 INFORMATION GIVING AND SPECIALISED MEDIA TRAINING; 1.2 THE PROVISION OF SMALL AMOUNTS OF FUNDING FOR ACTIVISTS, HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND BROADCASTERS TO ENABLE THEM TO BUILD LOCAL TEAMS AND TAKE MORE EFFECTIVE ACTION AND TO EXPLAIN VIA BROADCAST MEDIA THE LINKS BETWEEN FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION AND MATERNAL AND CHILD MORTALITY, FISTULA, INFERTILITY AND MENSTRUAL COMPLICATIONS; AND 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH IN WOMEN AND GIRLS BY: 2.1 PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE AND WORKING CLOSELY WITH ACTIVISTS AND BROADCASTERS AROUND THE WORLD AND ESPECIALLY IN AFRICA TO BUILD TEAMS ON A LOCAL LEVEL WITH THE AIM OF CREATING GREATER REACH FOR MESSAGING ABOUT THE IMPACT OF FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION IN THEIR COUNTRY; 2.2 PRODUCING MEDIA COMMUNICATIONS WHICH OPEN UP CONVERSATIONS ABOUT FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION AT THE LOCAL, NATIONAL AND GLOBAL LEVEL IN ORDER TO GENERATE CHANGE AND WORK TOWARDS A WORLD WHICH IS FREE OF FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION; AND 2.3 PROMOTING AWARENESS TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING ABOUT THE LIFE-THREATENING DANGERS OF FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION AND TO DISCOURAGE AND ELIMINATE THE NEGATIVE SOCIAL CONSEQUENCES FOR THOSE WHO DO NOT CONFORM AND ACCEPT THIS PRACTICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 BRECKNOCK ROAD
LONDON
N7 0DD
- Phone:
- 07776136013
- Email:
- mano@globalmediacampaign.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window