Financial history BLACKBURN RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1177142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £116.64k £116.64k £121.51k £140.30k £125.72k
Total expenditure £68.21k £68.21k £95.23k £109.70k £102.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £64.87k £8.00k N/A N/A