Trustees BLACKBURN RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity number: 1177142

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN JOHN HOLCROFT | Chair | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Williams | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory David Nicholls | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gregson | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Whitman | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Allanson | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morris | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Porter | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Paul Westhead | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DINO EDUARDO RADICE | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HUGH GRAHAM | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Richard YATES | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.