THE ATLANTIC AVENGERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE COUNTY OF KENT TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CHARITABLE AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS TO ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO FACILITIES AND OTHER SERVICES THAT WILL ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO TAKE PART IN A RANGE OF SPORTS AND ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIM GARDINER | Chair | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES OSBORNE | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Reina | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dix | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ENRIQUE IGLESIA REINA | Trustee | 07 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JON WILSON | Trustee | 07 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CARNEY | Trustee | 07 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.23k | £8.90k | £495 | £993 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.30k | £9.37k | £15.30k | £121 | £13.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 October 2024 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 07 October 2024 | 221 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 October 2024 | 587 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 07 October 2024 | 587 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 August 2022 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 August 2022 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 234 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE COUNTY OF KENT TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CHARITABLE AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS TO ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO FACILITIES AND OTHER SERVICES THAT WILL ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO TAKE PART IN A RANGE OF SPORTS AND ACTIVITIES THAT ARE CAPABLE OF PROMOTING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE “CHARITIES” ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. “VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS” ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Castle View
Castle Road
Saltwood
HYTHE
CT21 4QY
- Phone:
- 07787550136
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window