CROYDON AFFORDABLE HOUSING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity are to support the provision of housing for the relief of those in need, the advancement of education and the advancement of health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
Governance
- 01 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nish Popat | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.07k | £61.75k | £61.75k | £116.84k | £82.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £5.50k | £9.58k | £10.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 November 2021 | 490 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 November 2021 | 490 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO CARRY OUT ALL PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION, SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Azets Holdings Ltd
Regis House
45 King William Street
LONDON
EC4R 9AN
- Phone:
- 02087266000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window