MEETING POINT TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meeting Point Trust, offers a comprehensive array of services from Meeting Point House, which is located in the centre of Telford. The facilities on offer include office space for local charities offering support services to the local community, conference and training rooms, an on site cafe, and a refreshment service to users. A range of wellbeing services are also delivered to local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 13 January 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Kelly Middelton | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Scott | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Currie | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|||||
David Rolfe | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev David Lavender | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Raemonde Catherine Evans | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
The Reverend Keith Leslie Osmund - Smith | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Councillor David George Wright | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.30k | £225.20k | £289.53k | £391.11k | £429.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £361.09k | £222.91k | £283.96k | £362.81k | £374.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.84k | £6.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 NOVEMBER 1980 as amended on 27 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN TH INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE ACTIVITIES OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITH THE OBJECT ON IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS THEREOF. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
TELFORD AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS IN SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MEETING POINT HOUSE
SOUTHWATER SQUARE
TOWN CENTRE
TELFORD
SHROPSHIRE
TF3 4HS
- Phone:
- 01952292268
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window