CHELVESTON WIND FARM COMMUNITY BENEFIT FUND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust was set up to distribute funds from the Chelveston Wind Farm Community Benefit Fund to eligible bodies or organisations within the four parishes in which the Wind Farm site lies - Chelveston-cum-Caldecott, Dean & Shelton, Hargrave, and Melchbourne & Yelden
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 November 2018: Standard registration
- WIND FARM TRUST (Working name)
- CHELVESTON WIND FARM COMMUNITY BENEFIT TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUNCAN CHARLES FARRINGTON | Chair | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Martin Cuthbert | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Ronald Charles Grasmeder | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason John Gordon | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Robert Young | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Pentland | Trustee | 02 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN-LUC JANET | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLEY HOW | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.13k | £31.26k | £32.74k | £37.01k | £41.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.83k | £34.24k | £25.13k | £18.84k | £28.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 NOV 2018 as amended on 31 Mar 2014 as amended on 30 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE CIVIL PARISHES OF CHELVESTON-CUM-CALDECOTT IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE, DEAN AND SHELTON IN UNITARY DISTRICT OF BEDFORD BOROUGH, HARGRAVE IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE, AND MELCHBOURNE AND YELDEN IN THE UNITARY DISTRICT OF BEDFORD BOROUGH AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashbury
Caldecott
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN9 6AR
- Phone:
- (01933) 42 32 42
- Email:
- clerk@windfarmtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window